All federal councillors since 1848
|
Name
|
Party
|
Canton
|
Election
|
Resignation
|
|
Jans, Beat
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Basel-City (BS)
|
13.12.2023
|
|
|
Baume-Schneider, Elisabeth
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Jura (JU)
|
07.12.2022
|
|
|
Rösti, Albert
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
07.12.2022
|
|
|
Amherd, Viola
|
The Centre
|
Valais (VS)
|
05.12.2018
|
|
|
Keller-Sutter, Karin
|
Free Democratic Party
|
St Gallen (SG)
|
05.12.2018
|
|
|
Cassis, Ignazio
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Ticino (TI)
|
20.09.2017
|
|
|
Parmelin, Guy
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
09.12.2015
|
|
|
Berset, Alain
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Fribourg (FR)
|
14.12.2011
|
31.12.2023
|
|
Schneider-Ammann, Johann N.
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
22.09.2010
|
31.12.2018
|
|
Sommaruga, Simonetta
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
22.09.2010
|
31.12.2022
|
|
Burkhalter, Didier
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Neuchâtel (NE)
|
16.09.2009
|
31.10.2017
|
|
Maurer, Ueli
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
10.12.2008
|
31.12.2022
|
|
Widmer-Schlumpf, Eveline
|
Conservative Democratic Party
|
Graubünden (GR)
|
12.12.2007
|
31.12.2015
|
|
Leuthard, Doris
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Aargau (AG)
|
14.06.2006
|
31.12.2018
|
|
Blocher, Christoph
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
10.12.2003
|
|
|
Merz, Hans-Rudolf
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Appenzell Ausserrhoden (AR)
|
10.12.2003
|
31.10.2010
|
|
Calmy-Rey, Micheline
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Geneva (GE)
|
04.12.2002
|
31.12.2011
|
|
Schmid, Samuel
|
Conservative Democratic Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
06.12.2000
|
31.12.2008
|
|
Deiss, Joseph
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Fribourg (FR)
|
11.03.1999
|
31.07.2006
|
|
Metzler-Arnold, Ruth
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Appenzell Innerrhoden (AI)
|
11.03.1999
|
|
|
Couchepin, Pascal
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Valais (VS)
|
11.03.1998
|
31.10.2009
|
|
Leuenberger, Moritz
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
27.09.1995
|
31.10.2010
|
|
Dreifuss, Ruth
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Geneva (GE)
|
10.03.1993
|
31.12.2002
|
|
Villiger, Kaspar
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Lucerne (LU)
|
01.02.1989
|
31.12.2003
|
|
Felber, René
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Neuchâtel (NE)
|
09.12.1987
|
31.03.1993
|
|
Ogi , Adolf
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
09.12.1987
|
31.12.2000
|
|
Cotti , Flavio
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Ticino (TI)
|
10.12.1986
|
30.04.1999
|
|
Koller, Arnold
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Appenzell Innerrhoden (AI)
|
10.12.1986
|
30.04.1999
|
|
Kopp, Elisabeth
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
02.10.1984
|
12.01.1989
|
|
Delamuraz, Jean-Pascal
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
07.12.1983
|
31.03.1998
|
|
Stich, Otto
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Solothurn (SO)
|
07.12.1983
|
31.10.1995
|
|
Egli, Alphons
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Lucerne (LU)
|
08.12.1982
|
31.12.1986
|
|
Friedrich, Rudolf
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
08.12.1982
|
20.10.1984
|
|
Schlumpf , Leon
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Graubünden (GR)
|
05.12.1979
|
31.12.1987
|
|
Aubert, Pierre
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Neuchâtel (NE)
|
07.12.1977
|
31.12.1987
|
|
Honegger, Fritz
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
07.12.1977
|
31.12.1982
|
|
Chevallaz, Georges-André
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
05.12.1973
|
31.12.1983
|
|
Hürlimann, Hans
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Zug (ZG)
|
05.12.1973
|
31.12.1982
|
|
Ritschard, Willi
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Solothurn (SO)
|
05.12.1973
|
16.10.1983
|
|
Furgler, Kurt
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
St Gallen (SG)
|
08.12.1971
|
31.12.1986
|
|
Brugger, Ernst
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
10.12.1969
|
31.01.1978
|
|
Graber, Pierre
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Neuchâtel (NE)
|
10.12.1969
|
31.01.1978
|
|
Celio, Nello
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Ticino (TI)
|
14.12.1966
|
31.12.1973
|
|
Gnägi, Rudolf
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
08.12.1965
|
31.12.1979
|
|
Bonvin, Roger
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Valais (VS)
|
27.09.1962
|
31.12.1973
|
|
Schaffner, Hans
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Aargau (AG)
|
15.06.1961
|
31.12.1969
|
|
Bourgknecht, Jean
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Fribourg (FR)
|
17.12.1959
|
30.09.1962
|
|
Spühler, Willy
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
17.12.1959
|
31.01.1970
|
|
Tschudi, Hans-Peter
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Basel-City (BS)
|
17.12.1959
|
31.12.1973
|
|
von Moos, Ludwig
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Obwald (OW)
|
17.12.1959
|
31.12.1971
|
|
Wahlen, Friedrich Traugott
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
11.12.1958
|
31.12.1965
|
|
Chaudet, Paul
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
16.12.1954
|
31.12.1966
|
|
Holenstein, Thomas
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
St Gallen (SG)
|
16.12.1954
|
31.12.1959
|
|
Lepori, Giuseppe
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Ticino (TI)
|
16.12.1954
|
31.12.1959
|
|
Streuli, Hans
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
22.12.1953
|
31.12.1959
|
|
Feldmann, Markus
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
13.12.1951
|
03.11.1958
|
|
Weber, Max
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
13.12.1951
|
31.01.1954
|
|
Escher, Josef
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Valais (VS)
|
14.09.1950
|
09.12.1954
|
|
Rubattel, Rodolphe
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
11.12.1947
|
31.12.1954
|
|
Petitpierre, Max
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Neuchâtel (NE)
|
14.12.1944
|
30.06.1961
|
|
Nobs, Ernst
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
15.12.1943
|
31.12.1951
|
|
Kobelt , Karl
|
Free Democratic Party
|
St Gallen (SG)
|
10.12.1940
|
31.12.1954
|
|
von Steiger, Eduard
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
10.12.1940
|
31.12.1951
|
|
Stampfli, Walther
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Solothurn (SO)
|
18.07.1940
|
31.12.1947
|
|
Celio, Enrico
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Ticino (TI)
|
22.02.1940
|
15.10.1950
|
|
Wetter, Ernst
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
15.12.1938
|
31.12.1943
|
|
Obrecht, Hermann
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Solothurn (SO)
|
04.04.1935
|
31.07.1940
|
|
Etter, Philipp
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Zug (ZG)
|
28.03.1934
|
31.12.1959
|
|
Baumann, Johannes
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Appenzell Ausserrhoden (AR)
|
22.03.1934
|
31.12.1940
|
|
Meyer, Albert
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
12.12.1929
|
31.12.1938
|
|
Minger, Rudolf
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
12.12.1929
|
31.12.1940
|
|
Pilet-Golaz, Marcel
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
13.12.1928
|
31.12.1944
|
|
Häberlin, Heinrich
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Thurgau (TG)
|
12.02.1920
|
30.04.1934
|
|
Chuard, Ernest
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
11.12.1919
|
31.12.1928
|
|
Musy, Jean-Marie
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Fribourg (FR)
|
11.12.1919
|
30.04.1934
|
|
Scheurer, Karl
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
11.12.1919
|
14.11.1929
|
|
Haab, Robert
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
13.12.1917
|
31.12.1929
|
|
Ador, Gustave
|
Liberal Party
|
Geneva (GE)
|
26.06.1917
|
31.12.1919
|
|
Calonder, Felix-Louis
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Graubünden (GR)
|
12.06.1913
|
31.12.1919
|
|
Decoppet, Camille
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
17.07.1912
|
31.12.1919
|
|
Schulthess, Edmund
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Aargau (AG)
|
17.07.1912
|
15.04.1935
|
|
Perrier, Louis
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Neuchâtel (NE)
|
12.03.1912
|
16.05.1913
|
|
Motta, Giuseppe
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Ticino (TI)
|
14.12.1911
|
23.01.1940
|
|
Hoffmann, Arthur
|
Free Democratic Party
|
St Gallen (SG)
|
04.04.1911
|
19.06.1917
|
|
Schobinger, Josef Anton
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Lucerne (LU)
|
17.06.1908
|
27.11.1911
|
|
Forrer, Ludwig
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
11.12.1902
|
31.12.1917
|
|
Comtesse , Robert
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Neuchâtel (NE)
|
14.12.1899
|
04.03.1912
|
|
Ruchet, Marc-Emile
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
14.12.1899
|
13.07.1912
|
|
Brenner, Ernst
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Basel-City (BS)
|
25.03.1897
|
11.03.1911
|
|
Müller, Eduard
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
16.08.1895
|
09.11.1919
|
|
Ruffy, Eugène
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
14.12.1893
|
31.10.1899
|
|
Lachenal, Adrien
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Geneva (GE)
|
15.12.1892
|
31.12.1899
|
|
Zemp, Joseph
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Lucerne (LU)
|
17.12.1891
|
17.06.1908
|
|
Frey, Emil
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Basel-Land (BL)
|
11.12.1890
|
31.03.1897
|
|
Hauser, Walter
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
13.12.1888
|
22.10.1902
|
|
Deucher, Adolf
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Thurgau (TG)
|
10.04.1883
|
10.07.1912
|
|
Ruchonnet , Antoine Louis John
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
03.03.1881
|
14.09.1893
|
|
Hertenstein, Wilhelm
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
21.03.1879
|
27.11.1888
|
|
Bavier , Simeon
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Graubünden (GR)
|
10.12.1878
|
05.01.1883
|
|
Droz, Numa
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Neuchâtel (NE)
|
18.12.1875
|
31.12.1892
|
|
Anderwert , Fridolin
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Thurgau (TG)
|
10.12.1875
|
25.12.1880
|
|
Hammer, Bernhard
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Solothurn (SO)
|
10.12.1875
|
31.12.1890
|
|
Heer, Joachim
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Glarus (GL)
|
10.12.1875
|
31.12.1878
|
|
Borel, Eugène
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Neuchâtel (NE)
|
07.12.1872
|
31.12.1875
|
|
Scherer, Johann Jakob
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
12.07.1872
|
23.12.1878
|
|
Ceresole, Paul
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
01.02.1870
|
31.12.1875
|
|
Ruffy, Victor
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
06.12.1867
|
29.12.1869
|
|
Welti, Emil
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Aargau (AG)
|
08.12.1866
|
31.12.1891
|
|
Challet-Venel, Jean-Jacques
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Geneva (GE)
|
12.07.1864
|
|
|
Schenk, Karl
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
12.12.1863
|
18.07.1895
|
|
Dubs, Jakob
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
30.07.1861
|
28.05.1872
|
|
Pioda, Giovanni Battista
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Ticino (TI)
|
30.07.1857
|
26.01.1864
|
|
Knüsel , Melchior Josef Martin
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Lucerne (LU)
|
14.07.1855
|
31.12.1875
|
|
Fornerod, Constant
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
11.07.1855
|
31.10.1867
|
|
Stämpfli, Jakob
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
06.12.1854
|
31.12.1863
|
|
Druey, Daniel-Henri
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
16.11.1848
|
29.03.1855
|
|
Franscini, Stefano
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Ticino (TI)
|
16.11.1848
|
19.07.1857
|
|
Frey-Herosé, Friedrich
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Aargau (AG)
|
16.11.1848
|
31.12.1866
|
|
Furrer, Jonas
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
16.11.1848
|
25.07.1861
|
|
Munzinger, Martin J.
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Solothurn (SO)
|
16.11.1848
|
06.02.1855
|
|
Naeff, Wilhelm Matthias
|
Free Democratic Party
|
St Gallen (SG)
|
16.11.1848
|
31.12.1875
|
|
Ochsenbein, Ulrich
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
16.11.1848
|
|
|
Name
|
Party
|
Canton
|
Election
|
Resignation
|
|
Jans, Beat
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Basel-City (BS)
|
13.12.2023
|
|
|
Baume-Schneider, Elisabeth
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Jura (JU)
|
07.12.2022
|
|
|
Rösti, Albert
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
07.12.2022
|
|
|
Amherd, Viola
|
The Centre
|
Valais (VS)
|
05.12.2018
|
|
|
Keller-Sutter, Karin
|
Free Democratic Party
|
St Gallen (SG)
|
05.12.2018
|
|
|
Cassis, Ignazio
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Ticino (TI)
|
20.09.2017
|
|
|
Parmelin, Guy
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
09.12.2015
|
|
|
Berset, Alain
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Fribourg (FR)
|
14.12.2011
|
31.12.2023
|
|
Schneider-Ammann, Johann N.
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
22.09.2010
|
31.12.2018
|
|
Sommaruga, Simonetta
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
22.09.2010
|
31.12.2022
|
|
Burkhalter, Didier
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Neuchâtel (NE)
|
16.09.2009
|
31.10.2017
|
|
Maurer, Ueli
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
10.12.2008
|
31.12.2022
|
|
Widmer-Schlumpf, Eveline
|
Conservative Democratic Party
|
Graubünden (GR)
|
12.12.2007
|
31.12.2015
|
|
Leuthard, Doris
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Aargau (AG)
|
14.06.2006
|
31.12.2018
|
|
Blocher, Christoph
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
10.12.2003
|
|
|
Merz, Hans-Rudolf
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Appenzell Ausserrhoden (AR)
|
10.12.2003
|
31.10.2010
|
|
Calmy-Rey, Micheline
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Geneva (GE)
|
04.12.2002
|
31.12.2011
|
|
Schmid, Samuel
|
Conservative Democratic Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
06.12.2000
|
31.12.2008
|
|
Deiss, Joseph
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Fribourg (FR)
|
11.03.1999
|
31.07.2006
|
|
Metzler-Arnold, Ruth
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Appenzell Innerrhoden (AI)
|
11.03.1999
|
|
|
Couchepin, Pascal
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Valais (VS)
|
11.03.1998
|
31.10.2009
|
|
Leuenberger, Moritz
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
27.09.1995
|
31.10.2010
|
|
Dreifuss, Ruth
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Geneva (GE)
|
10.03.1993
|
31.12.2002
|
|
Villiger, Kaspar
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Lucerne (LU)
|
01.02.1989
|
31.12.2003
|
|
Felber, René
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Neuchâtel (NE)
|
09.12.1987
|
31.03.1993
|
|
Ogi , Adolf
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
09.12.1987
|
31.12.2000
|
|
Cotti , Flavio
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Ticino (TI)
|
10.12.1986
|
30.04.1999
|
|
Koller, Arnold
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Appenzell Innerrhoden (AI)
|
10.12.1986
|
30.04.1999
|
|
Kopp, Elisabeth
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
02.10.1984
|
12.01.1989
|
|
Delamuraz, Jean-Pascal
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
07.12.1983
|
31.03.1998
|
|
Stich, Otto
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Solothurn (SO)
|
07.12.1983
|
31.10.1995
|
|
Egli, Alphons
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Lucerne (LU)
|
08.12.1982
|
31.12.1986
|
|
Friedrich, Rudolf
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
08.12.1982
|
20.10.1984
|
|
Schlumpf , Leon
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Graubünden (GR)
|
05.12.1979
|
31.12.1987
|
|
Aubert, Pierre
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Neuchâtel (NE)
|
07.12.1977
|
31.12.1987
|
|
Honegger, Fritz
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
07.12.1977
|
31.12.1982
|
|
Chevallaz, Georges-André
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
05.12.1973
|
31.12.1983
|
|
Hürlimann, Hans
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Zug (ZG)
|
05.12.1973
|
31.12.1982
|
|
Ritschard, Willi
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Solothurn (SO)
|
05.12.1973
|
16.10.1983
|
|
Furgler, Kurt
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
St Gallen (SG)
|
08.12.1971
|
31.12.1986
|
|
Brugger, Ernst
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
10.12.1969
|
31.01.1978
|
|
Graber, Pierre
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Neuchâtel (NE)
|
10.12.1969
|
31.01.1978
|
|
Celio, Nello
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Ticino (TI)
|
14.12.1966
|
31.12.1973
|
|
Gnägi, Rudolf
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
08.12.1965
|
31.12.1979
|
|
Bonvin, Roger
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Valais (VS)
|
27.09.1962
|
31.12.1973
|
|
Schaffner, Hans
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Aargau (AG)
|
15.06.1961
|
31.12.1969
|
|
Bourgknecht, Jean
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Fribourg (FR)
|
17.12.1959
|
30.09.1962
|
|
Spühler, Willy
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
17.12.1959
|
31.01.1970
|
|
Tschudi, Hans-Peter
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Basel-City (BS)
|
17.12.1959
|
31.12.1973
|
|
von Moos, Ludwig
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Obwald (OW)
|
17.12.1959
|
31.12.1971
|
|
Wahlen, Friedrich Traugott
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
11.12.1958
|
31.12.1965
|
|
Chaudet, Paul
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
16.12.1954
|
31.12.1966
|
|
Holenstein, Thomas
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
St Gallen (SG)
|
16.12.1954
|
31.12.1959
|
|
Lepori, Giuseppe
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Ticino (TI)
|
16.12.1954
|
31.12.1959
|
|
Streuli, Hans
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
22.12.1953
|
31.12.1959
|
|
Feldmann, Markus
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
13.12.1951
|
03.11.1958
|
|
Weber, Max
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
13.12.1951
|
31.01.1954
|
|
Escher, Josef
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Valais (VS)
|
14.09.1950
|
09.12.1954
|
|
Rubattel, Rodolphe
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
11.12.1947
|
31.12.1954
|
|
Petitpierre, Max
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Neuchâtel (NE)
|
14.12.1944
|
30.06.1961
|
|
Nobs, Ernst
|
Social Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
15.12.1943
|
31.12.1951
|
|
Kobelt , Karl
|
Free Democratic Party
|
St Gallen (SG)
|
10.12.1940
|
31.12.1954
|
|
von Steiger, Eduard
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
10.12.1940
|
31.12.1951
|
|
Stampfli, Walther
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Solothurn (SO)
|
18.07.1940
|
31.12.1947
|
|
Celio, Enrico
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Ticino (TI)
|
22.02.1940
|
15.10.1950
|
|
Wetter, Ernst
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
15.12.1938
|
31.12.1943
|
|
Obrecht, Hermann
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Solothurn (SO)
|
04.04.1935
|
31.07.1940
|
|
Etter, Philipp
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Zug (ZG)
|
28.03.1934
|
31.12.1959
|
|
Baumann, Johannes
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Appenzell Ausserrhoden (AR)
|
22.03.1934
|
31.12.1940
|
|
Meyer, Albert
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
12.12.1929
|
31.12.1938
|
|
Minger, Rudolf
|
Swiss People’s Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
12.12.1929
|
31.12.1940
|
|
Pilet-Golaz, Marcel
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
13.12.1928
|
31.12.1944
|
|
Häberlin, Heinrich
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Thurgau (TG)
|
12.02.1920
|
30.04.1934
|
|
Chuard, Ernest
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
11.12.1919
|
31.12.1928
|
|
Musy, Jean-Marie
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Fribourg (FR)
|
11.12.1919
|
30.04.1934
|
|
Scheurer, Karl
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
11.12.1919
|
14.11.1929
|
|
Haab, Robert
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
13.12.1917
|
31.12.1929
|
|
Ador, Gustave
|
Liberal Party
|
Geneva (GE)
|
26.06.1917
|
31.12.1919
|
|
Calonder, Felix-Louis
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Graubünden (GR)
|
12.06.1913
|
31.12.1919
|
|
Decoppet, Camille
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
17.07.1912
|
31.12.1919
|
|
Schulthess, Edmund
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Aargau (AG)
|
17.07.1912
|
15.04.1935
|
|
Perrier, Louis
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Neuchâtel (NE)
|
12.03.1912
|
16.05.1913
|
|
Motta, Giuseppe
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Ticino (TI)
|
14.12.1911
|
23.01.1940
|
|
Hoffmann, Arthur
|
Free Democratic Party
|
St Gallen (SG)
|
04.04.1911
|
19.06.1917
|
|
Schobinger, Josef Anton
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Lucerne (LU)
|
17.06.1908
|
27.11.1911
|
|
Forrer, Ludwig
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
11.12.1902
|
31.12.1917
|
|
Comtesse , Robert
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Neuchâtel (NE)
|
14.12.1899
|
04.03.1912
|
|
Ruchet, Marc-Emile
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
14.12.1899
|
13.07.1912
|
|
Brenner, Ernst
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Basel-City (BS)
|
25.03.1897
|
11.03.1911
|
|
Müller, Eduard
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
16.08.1895
|
09.11.1919
|
|
Ruffy, Eugène
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
14.12.1893
|
31.10.1899
|
|
Lachenal, Adrien
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Geneva (GE)
|
15.12.1892
|
31.12.1899
|
|
Zemp, Joseph
|
Christian Democratic People’s Party
|
Lucerne (LU)
|
17.12.1891
|
17.06.1908
|
|
Frey, Emil
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Basel-Land (BL)
|
11.12.1890
|
31.03.1897
|
|
Hauser, Walter
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
13.12.1888
|
22.10.1902
|
|
Deucher, Adolf
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Thurgau (TG)
|
10.04.1883
|
10.07.1912
|
|
Ruchonnet , Antoine Louis John
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
03.03.1881
|
14.09.1893
|
|
Hertenstein, Wilhelm
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
21.03.1879
|
27.11.1888
|
|
Bavier , Simeon
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Graubünden (GR)
|
10.12.1878
|
05.01.1883
|
|
Droz, Numa
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Neuchâtel (NE)
|
18.12.1875
|
31.12.1892
|
|
Anderwert , Fridolin
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Thurgau (TG)
|
10.12.1875
|
25.12.1880
|
|
Hammer, Bernhard
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Solothurn (SO)
|
10.12.1875
|
31.12.1890
|
|
Heer, Joachim
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Glarus (GL)
|
10.12.1875
|
31.12.1878
|
|
Borel, Eugène
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Neuchâtel (NE)
|
07.12.1872
|
31.12.1875
|
|
Scherer, Johann Jakob
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
12.07.1872
|
23.12.1878
|
|
Ceresole, Paul
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
01.02.1870
|
31.12.1875
|
|
Ruffy, Victor
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
06.12.1867
|
29.12.1869
|
|
Welti, Emil
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Aargau (AG)
|
08.12.1866
|
31.12.1891
|
|
Challet-Venel, Jean-Jacques
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Geneva (GE)
|
12.07.1864
|
|
|
Schenk, Karl
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
12.12.1863
|
18.07.1895
|
|
Dubs, Jakob
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
30.07.1861
|
28.05.1872
|
|
Pioda, Giovanni Battista
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Ticino (TI)
|
30.07.1857
|
26.01.1864
|
|
Knüsel , Melchior Josef Martin
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Lucerne (LU)
|
14.07.1855
|
31.12.1875
|
|
Fornerod, Constant
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
11.07.1855
|
31.10.1867
|
|
Stämpfli, Jakob
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
06.12.1854
|
31.12.1863
|
|
Druey, Daniel-Henri
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Vaud (VD)
|
16.11.1848
|
29.03.1855
|
|
Franscini, Stefano
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Ticino (TI)
|
16.11.1848
|
19.07.1857
|
|
Frey-Herosé, Friedrich
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Aargau (AG)
|
16.11.1848
|
31.12.1866
|
|
Furrer, Jonas
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Zurich (ZH)
|
16.11.1848
|
25.07.1861
|
|
Munzinger, Martin J.
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Solothurn (SO)
|
16.11.1848
|
06.02.1855
|
|
Naeff, Wilhelm Matthias
|
Free Democratic Party
|
St Gallen (SG)
|
16.11.1848
|
31.12.1875
|
|
Ochsenbein, Ulrich
|
Free Democratic Party
|
Bern (BE)
|
16.11.1848
|
|